Hamilton, Leslie Erin (CPSO#: 90452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Pathology Lab
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-7600 Ext. 2241
Fax: 613-738-4837
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ERIN HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 08 Jun 2009 to 24 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 01 Mar 2013
Elective Trainee - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2018