Hamilton, Mika (CPSO#: 107236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Eaton 3N-402
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIKA HAMILTON may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HAMILTON is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HAMILTON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAMILTON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HAMILTON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. HAMILTON ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. HAMILTON ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jun 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2018