Hammad, Nazik Hammad Mohammed (CPSO#: 90355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Apr 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 4502
Fax: (613) 546-8209
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nazik Hammad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hammad ( CPSO# 90355 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Apr 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 06 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Nazik Hammad Mohammed Hammad may practise medicine independently in medical
            oncology, only.