Hammett, John David (CPSO#: 21998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan St W
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 407-1727
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Minaki Nursing Station
235 Winnipeg Avenue
Minaki ON  P0X 1J0
Canada
Phone: (807) 224-3531
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Sioux Narrows Nursing Staion
Box 27
Sioux Narrows ON  P0X 1N0
Canada
Phone: (807) 226-1081
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hammett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hammett ( CPSO# 21998 )

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 407-1727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 19, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John David Hammett in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hammett to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOHN DAVID HAMMETT
                                          ("Dr. Hammett")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hammett, certificate of registration number 21998, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, I was required
                  to undergo a specified continuing education and remediation program
                  ("SCERP"). I enter into this Undertaking in lieu of completing the
                  reassessment portion of the SCERP. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that I currently have hospital privileges at
                  Lake of the Woods District Hospital ("LWDH"). 

            (4)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that I do not practice at any practice
                  location, including but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and
                  offices, in any jurisdiction other than LWDH (collectively, my "Practice
                  Location" or "Practice Locations"), nor do I have privileges at any other
                  hospital whatsoever. 
            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice
                        of medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient
                        whatsoever.
                  
            (b)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice will
                  be limited in the following ways:

                  (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                        surgeon:
                  
                        a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons or
                              recognized as a surgical specialist by the College; and
                  
                        b.    who holds privileges at LWDH, or other Practice Location as
                              may be approved by the College,
                  
                              (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                  (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                        section (6)(b)(i) above:
                  
                        a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative care
                              whatsoever; and
                  
                  b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in attendance when I
                        am engaging in my practice as a surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (6)(b) above.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake that I will not commence surgical
                        assisting at any other Practice Location (other than LWDH) without
                        prior approval of the College. Should I seek privileges to perform
                        surgical assisting at any other Practice Location, I shall advise
                        the College within five (5) days of making such application, and
                        shall seek approval to practice surgical assisting at the Practice
                        Location at least fourteen (14) days before I plan to commence
                        surgical assisting at that location. 
                  
            (7)   Compliance and Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hammett, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations by a College
                        representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
                        the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Hammett, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "B".

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a
                  colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief
                  of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (14)  I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hammett, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Hammett's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment.  As a result, Dr. Hammett was
                              required to undergo a specified continuing education and
                              remediation program. In lieu of completing the reassessment
                              portion of the program, Dr. Hammett agreed to only practise
                              as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified
                              surgeon. Further, Dr. Hammett shall practice only at Lake of
                              the Woods District Hospital.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Hammett, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Qualified Surgeons and Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from
                  the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Hammett, give my irrevocable consent to any Qualified Surgeon and
                  any Chief of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.   

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John David Hammett to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 19, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Hammett's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Hammett was required to undergo a specified continuing education and remediation program. In lieu of completing the reassessment portion of the program, Dr. Hammett agreed to only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Hammett shall practice only at Lake of the Woods District Hospital.


Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Download Full Document (PDF)