Hamodat, Mowafak Mohamed Abdul Jabar (CPSO#: 89595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Oct 2013