Hampel, Elizabeth Maria (CPSO#: 83062)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 49463
Fax: (289) 398-1067
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Hampel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hampel ( CPSO# 83062 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARIA HAMPEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMPEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2011