Hamrahi, Hormoz (CPSO#: 77932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: 6476892193
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hormoz Hamrahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamrahi ( CPSO# 77932 )

Business Address:
220 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 895-5790

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HORMOZ HAMRAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMRAHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004