Hamza, Milan (CPSO#: 24448)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2000

Summary

Date of Death: 25-Jan-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Palacky, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000