Han, Kathy (CPSO#: 84467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2919
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathy Han Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Han ( CPSO# 84467 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHY HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012