Han, Mihan (CPSO#: 98079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mihan Han Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Han ( CPSO# 98079 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHAN HAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016