Haney, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 85947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Dept of Emergency Medicine:
LHSC
E1-125 : 800 Commissioners Rd. E.
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone: 519 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Haney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Haney ( CPSO# 85947 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
Urgent Care
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Emergency Department
London ON  N6C 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Feb 2007 to 09 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007