Hanif, Hasib Mohammed (CPSO#: 94151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 3404800
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASIB MOHAMMED HANIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANIF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2016