Hanley, Erin Lesley Margaret (CPSO#: 96265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  10 May 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Faculty of Health Sciences
Room MDCL 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN LESLEY MARGARET HANLEY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HANLEY is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. HANLEY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HANLEY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HANLEY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HANLEY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HANLEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 10 May 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 May 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 May 2019