Hanna, Bassem Matta Nashed (CPSO#: 91944)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 22 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014