Hanna, Brian Davison (CPSO#: 22163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Apr 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18 - 700 Glasgow St
Kitchener ON  N2M 2N8
Canada
Phone: (519) 498-0370
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian D. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hanna ( CPSO# 22163 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
Rheumatology Clinic
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
18 - 700 Glasgow Street
Kitchener ON  N2M 2N8
Phone Number: (519) 498-0370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN DAVISON HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1975