Hanna, Eriney Abdo Tadros (CPSO#: 111843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 5196612037
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERINEY ABDO TADROS HANNA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HANNA is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. HANNA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HANNA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HANNA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HANNA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HANNA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Sep 2017
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019