Hanna, Glen Raymond (CPSO#: 73415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Eagle st suite 201
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-3727
Fax: (905) 853-7537
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

205-955 Major Mackenzie drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-3544
Fax: (905) 417-6675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Units 4&5
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-2519
Fax: (905) 898-7239
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

222 Wellington St East
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Canada
Phone: 905 5035300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glen Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hanna ( CPSO# 73415 )

Business Address:
201 - 235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3V 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 200
222 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 503-5300

Business Address:
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 205
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 417-3544

Business Address:
490 Harry Walker Parkway
Units 4 and 5
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 898-2519

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN RAYMOND HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004