Hanna, Magdy Messiha (CPSO#: 68359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Finch Midland Medical Center
Suite 308
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 299-5260
Fax: (416) 299-1404
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., June 25, 2012, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Magdy Messiha Hanna:

            (a)   Dr. Hanna is prohibited from prescribing:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food
                        and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
                  
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines
                        and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled
                        Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)
                  
            (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of
            Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A";
            and the current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B").

                  (v)   Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule "C" [to the Order])
                  
            (b)   Dr. Hanna shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the
                  form set out at Schedule "D" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this
                  sign shall state as follows:  "Dr. Hanna has relinquished his prescribing
                  privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations,
                  Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted Substances and
                  Monitored Drugs."

            (c)   Dr. Hanna will undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                  supervisor, for six (6) months, who is acceptable to the College
                  ("Clinical Supervisor") and who shall meet with him on a monthly basis
                  and review 10 charts per month.  Attached [to the Order] as Schedule "E"
                  is a copy of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking.

            (d)   Within approximately one (1) year, Dr. Hanna shall undergo a re
                  assessment of his clinical practice by a College-appointed assessor
                  ("Assessor").  The Assessor shall report the results of this assessment
                  to the College and Dr. Hanna shall abide by all recommendations made by
                  the Assessor and the College.

            (e)   Dr. Hanna must successfully complete, at his own expense,
                  College-facilitated instruction in Medical Ethics.

            (f)   Dr. Hanna shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice
                  and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of
                  monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of the Order, such
                  as giving consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP
                  and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in
                  order for the College to monitor Dr. Hanna's compliance with this Order.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Jun 2012
Summary:

On June 25, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Magdy Messiha Hanna committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Hanna is incompetent. Dr. Hanna 
admitted the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. 
 
Dr. Hanna practises family medicine in Scarborough, Ontario.  
 
Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and is incompetent in his 
prescribing to 25 individuals without conducting an assessment, physical, or maintaining a chart. 
 
Dr. Hanna failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care, treatment 
and/or medical record keeping in relation to the patients referenced in an expert report resulting 
from a College investigation.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hanna's 
      Certificate of Registration: 
 
(a)   Dr. Hanna is prohibited from prescribing: 
 
      (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
            Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
      (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
            Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
 
      (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs 
            Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or 
 
      (iv)  Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and 
            Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) 
 
(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals 
and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are 
attached [to the Order] as Schedule "B"). 
 
      (v)   Monitored Drugs (as noted in Schedule "C" [to the Order]) 
 
(b)   Dr. Hanna shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at 
      Schedule "D" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:  "Dr. 
      Hanna has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to Narcotic Drugs, 
      Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and/or Other Targeted 
      Substances and Monitored Drugs." 
 
 
 
 
(c)   Dr. Hanna will undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor, for six 
      (6) months, who is acceptable to the College ("Clinical Supervisor") and who shall meet 
      with him on a monthly basis and review 10 charts per month.  Attached [to the Order] as 
      Schedule "E" is a copy of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking. 
 
(d)   Within approximately one (1) year, Dr. Hanna shall undergo a re assessment of his 
      clinical practice by a College-appointed assessor ("Assessor").  The Assessor shall report 
      the results of this assessment to the College and Dr. Hanna shall abide by all 
      recommendations made by the Assessor and the College. 
 
(e)   Dr. Hanna must successfully complete, at his own expense, College-facilitated instruction 
      in Medical Ethics. 
 
(f)   Dr. Hanna shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and such other 
      steps as the College may take for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
      with the terms of the Order, such as giving consent to the College to make appropriate 
      enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in 
      order for the College to monitor Dr. Hanna's compliance with this Order 
. 
2.    Dr. Hanna appear before it to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand recorded on 
      the register. 
 
3.    Dr. Hanna pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within thirty (30) days 
      from the date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 25, 2012

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: November 6, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)