Hanna, Rafik Bushra Abdel Messih (CPSO#: 78225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queenston Walk In Clinic
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone: (905) 578-5738
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hanna ( CPSO# 78225 )

Business Address:
Queenston Walk In Clinic
Suite 103
631 Queenston Road
Hamilton ON  L8K 6R5
Phone Number: (905) 578-9255

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFIK BUSHRA ABDEL MESSIH HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2006