Hanna, Wael Chadi (CPSO#: 92094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room T 2105
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35916
Fax: (905) 540-6564
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.C. Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hanna ( CPSO# 92094 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room T-2105
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAEL CHADI HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 18 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011