Hannouche, Fadi (CPSO#: 83496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

214 Colborne St. W
Whitby ON  L1N 1X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-2599
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1939 Kennedy Road
Suit 105
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 412-0505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

111 Simcoe north
Unit 100
Oshawa ON  M1P 2L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 412-0505
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hannouche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Hannouche ( CPSO# 83496 )

Business Address:
1939 Kennedy Road
Suite 105
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505

Business Address:
214 Colborne Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 1X2
Phone Number: (905) 665-2599

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADI HANNOUCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNOUCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Aug 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2005 to 01 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Nov 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009