Hapuarachchi, Milanthi (CPSO#: 87048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Milanthi Hapuarachchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hapuarachchi ( CPSO# 87048 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone Number: (905) 875-9999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILANTHI HAPUARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAPUARACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010