Harding, Lorin Gilbert (CPSO#: 30345)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 31, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorin Gilbert Harding to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harding failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his infection control practices. During the investigation, Dr. Harding resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)