Hardy-Brown, Karolyn Wendy (CPSO#: 85110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: Hardy, Karolyn Wendy (used until: 23 Jul 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6841
Fax: (705) 740-6891
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Brown & Hardy-Brown Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hardy-Brown ( CPSO# 85110 )
Dr. J. Brown ( CPSO# 81300 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
ICU A3
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5063

Business Address:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Suite 302
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAROLYN WENDY HARDY-BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDY-BROWN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 Jul 2006 to 30 Jul 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2007 to 09 Sep 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

McMaster University, 11 Feb 2008 to 09 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2009