Hare, Samanjit Singh (CPSO#: 91387)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of London, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 29 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2012