Harikumar, Usha (CPSO#: 82880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (647) 345-8627
Fax: (647) 345-8629
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Usha Harikumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Harikumar ( CPSO# 82880 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
1200 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (647) 345-8627

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA HARIKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARIKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011