Harish, Srinivasan (CPSO#: 83316)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-1465
Fax: (905) 528-1467
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Carlisle Ultrasound Services
1493 Centre Rd
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Canada
Phone: 9056893301
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Srinivasan Harish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )

Business Address:
G2 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
St. Josephs Healthcare
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0


Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. So ( CPSO# 76100 )
Dr. N. Muhn ( CPSO# 79555 )
Dr. J. Coret-Simon ( CPSO# 79858 )
Dr. F. Al-Douri ( CPSO# 81593 )
Dr. J. Kwok-Liu ( CPSO# 29730 )
Dr. R. Rebello ( CPSO# 71123 )
Dr. E. Haider ( CPSO# 84853 )
Dr. S. Harish ( CPSO# 83316 )
Dr. M. Voss ( CPSO# 74024 )
Dr. A. Coret ( CPSO# 79859 )
Dr. C. Boylan ( CPSO# 78775 )
Dr. J. O'Neill ( CPSO# 78167 )
Dr. O. Mironov ( CPSO# 107610)
Dr. A. Alabousi ( CPSO# 95414 )
Dr. E. Stubbs ( CPSO# 96256 )
Dr. V. Leung ( CPSO# 93077 )
Dr. M. El-Khodary ( CPSO# 99328 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-6009

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Business Address:
G1 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-1465

Business Address:
104- 1144 Wilson Street
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 648-5900

Business Address:
565 Sanatorium Road
Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L9C 7N4
Phone Number: (905) 389-0300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRINIVASAN HARISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008