Harman, John Kevin (CPSO#: 82103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 211
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L4
Phone: (705) 792-1222
Fax: (705) 792-1343
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KEVIN HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2014