Harmon, John Paul (CPSO#: 95984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7004
Fax: (705) 523-7340
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0
Canada
Phone: 7053682300
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Manitoulin
Electoral District: 08

6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: 7057464540
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

70 Spine Rd
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Canada
Phone: 7058487181
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

421 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: 7056478121
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

145 Government Rd E
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: 7055675251
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

101 Progress Cres
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: 7053376111
Fax: 7055237340
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Paul Harmon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harmon ( CPSO# 95984 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H6

Business Address:
145 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2

Business Address:
11 Meredith Street
Little Current ON  P0P 1K0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL HARMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jul 2011 to 22 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013