Harms, Sheila Christine (CPSO#: 79075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
3G-104 Child & Youth Mental Health
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 77327
Fax: (905) 577-8499
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Harms Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Harms ( CPSO# 79075 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
3G Child and Youth Mental Health
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA CHRISTINE HARMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008