Haroon, Babar Ali (CPSO#: 89774)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 21 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009