Harrington, David Michael (CPSO#: 94133)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017