Harrington, Jennifer Jean (CPSO#: 94111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2015

Expiry Date:  11 Dec 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Endocrinology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 228186
Fax: (416) 813-6304
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Dec 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 21 Nov 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Dec 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jennifer Jean Harrington may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Harrington holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Harrington no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Harrington's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Harrington's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on December 12, 2015. In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 11, 2022.