Harris, Aaron (CPSO#: 92808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012