Harris, David James (CPSO#: 95493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Paul's Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
1081 Burrard Street
Vancouver BC  V6Z 1Y6
Phone: 604-806-8667
Fax: 604-806-8683

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAMES HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 01 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015