Harris, Luke (CPSO#: 88340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1833 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4C8
Phone: (705) 472-8577
Fax: (705) 472-3025
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. McKenna and L. Harris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. McKenna ( CPSO# 88919 )
Dr. L. Harris ( CPSO# 88340 )

Business Address:
1833 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4C8
Phone Number: (705) 472-8577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKE HARRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013