Hart, Adam Jonathan (CPSO#: 105766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Mem. Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 9058452571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 9058452571 Ext. 5614
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hart Power Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Power ( CPSO# 105661)
Dr. A. Hart ( CPSO# 105766)

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H6

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Business Address:
4700 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM JONATHAN HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016