Hart, C Nathaniel (CPSO#: 109528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. C NATHANIEL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2018