Hart, Paul Lloyd (CPSO#: 26640)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Aug 2010