Hartford, James Anthony (CPSO#: 50689)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 05 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jan 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 5-Jan-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 05 Jan 2018