Harvey, Bartholomew John (CPSO#: 50692)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Associate Professor
Dalla Lana School of Public Health
University of Toronto
6th Floor, 155 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3M7
Phone: (416) 520-2466
Fax: (647) 247-9892
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Canada
Phone: (416) 314-4100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARTHOLOMEW JOHN HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1984 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985