Harvey, Caroline Ruth Ann (CPSO#: 93585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Armstrong, Caroline Ruth Ann (used until: 14 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE RUTH ANN HARVEY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HARVEY is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. HARVEY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HARVEY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HARVEY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HARVEY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HARVEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019