Hasegawa, Takuya (CPSO#: 82204)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tohoku Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Feb 2005 to 06 May 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 07 May 2005 to 14 Mar 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006