Hashemi, Bita (CPSO#: 91573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FE229-C.S.B
685 William Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0Z2
Phone: 204-787-4370
Fax: 204-787-1419

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BITA HASHEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015