Hashemzadeh Balouchi, Maliheh Ali (CPSO#: 81937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Kuwait University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Health Centre
Suite 302
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone: (289) 809-3131
Fax: (289) 809-3132
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hashemzadeh Balouchi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hashemzadeh Balouchi ( CPSO# 81937 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0B2
Phone Number: (289) 809-3131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALIHEH ALI HASHEMZADEH BALOUCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASHEMZADEH BALOUCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2004 to 26 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2004 to 03 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2006