Hashim, Shahzad (CPSO#: 94882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Division of Nephrology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 3470
Fax: (905) 813-3830
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2318 Dunwin
Unit 11
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C7
Canada
Phone: 9058281145
Fax: 9058281147
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Hashim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hashim ( CPSO# 94882 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Critical Care Unit
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
2318 Dunwin Drive
Unit 11
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Mar 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Jan 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Shahzad  Hashim  may  practice  medicine  independently  in internal
                  medicine and nephrology.