Haslah, Maja (CPSO#: 76483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West
Suite 400
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 366-0053
Fax: (289) 801-9960
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maja Haslah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haslah ( CPSO# 76483 )

Business Address:
101 The Queensway West
Suite 400
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 366-0053

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAJA HASLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003