Hassan, Khalid Ali Hussein (CPSO#: 78989)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2003 to 08 Aug 2003
PEAP - Resident - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2003 to 08 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2004 to 08 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2005 to 08 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2006 to 08 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2007 to 08 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2008 to 08 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Aug 2009