Hassan, Mohamed Hassan (CPSO#: 84088)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2006 to 09 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2011