Hassan, Tariq Mahmood (CPSO#: 94215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 5444900 Ext. 83010
Fax: (613) 540-6113
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Hassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hassan ( CPSO# 94215 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Queen's University
Department of Psychiatry
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 544-4900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARIQ MAHMOOD HASSAN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF PSYCHIATRY, QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY in which Dr. HASSAN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. HASSAN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. HASSAN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. HASSAN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. HASSAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Jun 2021.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017